Financial history KONNECT

Charity Number: 1078684
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £70.85k £57.48k £5.05k £235 £0
Total expenditure £63.11k £63.65k £2.97k £2.43k £9.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A