INDIAN FOUNDATION FOR EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE SUPPORT OF EDUCATIONAL DEVELOPMENT IN INDIA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Other Finance
- Bristol City
- India
Governance
- 14 January 2000: Standard registration
- 20 May 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- IFED (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4 OCTOBER 1999
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AMONGST THOSE LIVING IN INDIA WITH A PREFERENCE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS (AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) FOR THOSE LIVING IN GURGAON IN HARYANA NEAR DELHI, PARWANOO IN HIMACHAL PRADESH, NASIK IN MAHARESTRA, DEWAS IN MADHYA PARDESH, MULUND IN BOMBAY, MAHARASTRA AND PUNE IN MAHARASTRA NEAR BOMBAY) 2) THE FURTHER OF SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR AND NEEDY LIVING IN INDIA (AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE LIVING IN THE AREAS MENTIONED IN SUB-CLAUSE (1) OF THIS CLAUSE) AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
INDIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window