SIKH COMMUNITY CARE PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sikh community care project provides services for the social / health/ recreational / and cultural activities, to improve the quality of life of its members.SCCP provides training opportunities for women from Asian backgrounds. S.C.C.P runs elderly programme specifically targeting elderly from South Asian Communities,providing support,advice and guidance to access health and social care provision
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Redbridge
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 08 March 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Manjeet Kaur Chahal | Chair | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
RAJINDER KAUR SANDHU | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
PALLO KAUR JEER | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
SAVINDER KAUR SHERGILL | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
KAMALJEET KAUR THETHI | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
HARJINDER KAUR BHOGAL | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
RAJINDER KAUR DHANJAL | Trustee | 06 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOGINDER KAUR CHAND | Trustee | 06 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
NARINDER KAUR RHENSI | Trustee | 06 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
BALWINDER KAUR SAHOTA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.73k | £7.64k | £3.82k | £0 | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.58k | £7.64k | £3.82k | £0 | £800 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 April 2023 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 February 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17TH FEBRUARY 2000
Charitable objects
THE PROJECT'S OBJECTS ARE TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, PARTICULARLY THE PROVISION OF AN ADVICE CENTRE, KEEP FIT AND YOGA CLASSES, LANGUAGE CLASSES, ART AND CRAFT ACTIVITIES, CULTURALLY SPECIFIC DANCING ACTIVITIES, HEALTH CARE, A LUNCH CLUB AND OTHER COMMUNITY BASED ACTIVITIES, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE. THESE FACILITIES SHOULD PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, REFLECT THE NEEDS OF THE SIKH COMMUNITY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF WALTHAM FOREST.
Area of benefit
WALTHAM FOREST
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 ARGYLE ROAD
ILFORD
ESSEX
IG1 3BG
- Phone:
- 07904197316
- Email:
- sccpredbridge@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window