SENIOR UROLOGICAL REGISTRARS GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support and represent urology trainees through their training by providing a forum for trainees to discuss training issues and to express their opinions on training at national and regional levels. Annual scientific meeting to provide opportunities for trainees to share and present their work, meet other trainees, attend workshops and courses to further their training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 January 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 September 2000: Standard registration
- 12 July 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 12 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1127044 THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF UROLOGICAL SURGEONS LIM...
- SURG (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/01/2014 | 04/01/2015 | 04/01/2016 | 04/01/2017 | 04/01/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.58k | £1.84k | £6.17k | £1.64k | £1.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.86k | £3.56k | £5.26k | £3.44k | £3.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 January 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 January 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 04 January 2018 | 15 November 2018 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 January 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 January 2017 | 17 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 January 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 January 2016 | 31 August 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 January 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 APRIL 2000.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS IN THE PRACTICE OF THE SCIENCE OF UROLOGY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window