Accounts and annual returns BREEZE HILL MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity number: 1078586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 September 2024 228 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 September 2024 593 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 March 2022 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 March 2021 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required