Financial history BREEZE HILL MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity number: 1078586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13 £3 £1 £21 £85
Total expenditure £466 £0 £481 £526 £306
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A