Trustees DODDINGTON VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE
Charity number: 1078767

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Clark | Chair | 07 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Lesley Day | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laura Barker | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Abraham Coetzer | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joy Brown | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carl Robinson | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
PAUL HAYWARD | Trustee | 08 August 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.