Financial history D.A.F.F.O.D.I.L.S.

Charity number: 1080579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £189.20k £130.40k £165.17k £117.91k £153.78k
Total expenditure £167.74k £147.61k £133.82k £140.98k £141.67k
Income from government contracts £67.52k N/A N/A N/A £13.98k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £19.98k N/A