THE IRISH DRAUGHT HORSE SOCIETY (GREAT BRITAIN)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve and improve the Irish draught horse and to promote and maintain high standards of breeding, conformation, quality and soundness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 May 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES WILLIAM NOBLETT | Chair | 13 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Mark Richard Mortimer | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janet Margaret Sarsfield | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jane Seymour Imbush | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Diane Benson | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kerrilee Wilson | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Langley Mckim | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Ann Margaret Western | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Julia Glendenning | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alun Lloyd Davies | Trustee | 02 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JULIE CORNTHWAITE | Trustee | 16 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL WAKEFIELD | Trustee | 13 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER MARGARET CHAPLIN MA HONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NORMA GRUBB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY ELIZABETH MEYLER WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.10k | £55.42k | £107.79k | £117.26k | £117.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.43k | £55.15k | £106.28k | £123.38k | £103.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 January 2025 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 FEBRUARY 2000
Charitable objects
ARE TO PRESERVE AND IMPROVE THE IRISH DRAUGHT HORSE AND TO PROMOTE AND MAINTAIN HIGH STANDARDS OF BREEDING, CONFORMATION, QUALITY AND SOUNDNESS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Manor Farm Court
Old Wolverton Road
Old Wolverton
MILTON KEYNES
Buckinghamshire
MK12 5NN
- Phone:
- 01768870523
- Email:
- admin@idhsgb.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window