THE RAZOR EDGE THEATRE INITIATIVE LTD.
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 December 1999: Standard registration
- 03 March 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- RAZOR EDGE THEATRE INITIATIVE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2004 | 31/07/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.46k | £213.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.29k | £151.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | 07 June 2006 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | 23 June 2006 | 23 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2004 | 17 August 2005 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2004 | 17 August 2005 | 78 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30TH JULY 1999, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 9TH DECEMBER 1999 AND 8 AUGUST 2001
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ARTS BASED TRAINING WITH A VIEW TO HELPING THE BENEFICIARIES TO GROW TO FULL CITIZENSHIP AND REALISE THEIR FULL POTENTIAL AND GAIN USEFUL EMPLOYMENT. (B) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window