THE MAIDENHEAD MALACHI TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees will look to fund: 1. Grants to charities, individuals and groups in the UK and internationally to relieve poverty and hardship. These will include running costs such as staff salaries and overheads. 2. The promotion of the Christian gospel by a variety of means. 3. Grants for the purposes of relieving sickness and promoting good, particularly in underdeveloped nations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Rwanda
Governance
- 08 November 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Martin Hyde Sabiers | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET LILIAN HYDE | Trustee | 16 February 2012 |
|
|||||
SARA KATHRYN SABIERS HYDE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev JEREMY RICHARD GRANVILLE HYDE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JONATHAN MARTIN HYDE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH LILIAN HYDE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.80k | £48.47k | £34.73k | £34.64k | £32.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £164.73k | £150.27k | £54.26k | £58.76k | £83.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 SEPTEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO FULFIL SUCH PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES, PARTICULARLY BY MEANS OF MAKING GRANTS AND PROVIDING OTHER SUPPORT (WHETHER OF A FINANCIAL NATURE OR OTHER WISE), IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
4A Castlebar Park
LONDON
W5 1BX
- Phone:
- 02089979380
- Email:
- mheadmalachit@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window