Financial history ALEXANDRA MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity number: 1078061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 04/04/2021 03/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £887 £1.31k £711 £0 £510
Total expenditure £1.35k £733 £718 £718 £475
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A