Financial history STARLOW CHARITIES LIMITED

Charity number: 1081386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.08m £737.61k £1.18m £2.01m £1.86m
Total expenditure £1.57m £1.42m £1.75m £3.64m £1.95m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £554.30k £79.50k £527.00k £1.44m £1.33m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £520.84k £658.12k £657.52k £568.19k £526.72k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.42m £1.26m £1.46m £3.13m £1.15m
Expenditure - Raising funds £150.74k £155.21k £292.70k £519.75k £799.76k
Expenditure - Governance £215.73k £192.20k £6.82k £0 £11.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.21m £1.07m £1.45m £3.12m £1.14m
Expenditure - Investment management £150.74k £155.21k £292.70k £519.75k £799.76k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0