HARROWBARROW SCHOOL PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising throughout the year in order to support activities and buy equipment for our Primary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Cornwall
Governance
- 11 November 1999: Standard registration
- HARROWBARROW SCHOOL PSA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PRISKA SCHOENBORN | Trustee | 03 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL FAY LANE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.36k | £937 | £435 | £452 | £1.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.19k | £2.72k | £997 | £110 | £110 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 315 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 315 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 July 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 September 2022 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2021 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 APRIL 1999, AS AMENDED 21 NOVEMBER 2005 AND 18 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE HARROWBARROW SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harrowbarrow School
School Road
Harrowbarrow
Callington
PL17 8BQ
- Phone:
- 01579 350576
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window