Accounts and annual returns ST FRANCIS PERSIAN CAT RESCUE

Charity number: 1080140
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 24 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 22 October 2008 265 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted