ST FRANCIS PERSIAN CAT RESCUE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity for the rescueing and re-homing of Persian and other long-haired pedigree breeds of cat. All cats are given full veterinary treatment when needed and leave the rescue fully vaccinated , spayed/neutered. Although based in North Yorkshire we rescue and re-home throughout the UK and Eire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 30 March 2000: Standard registration
- 09 September 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.11k | £3.82k | £7.98k | £26.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.22k | £3.81k | £8.05k | £9.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 24 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 22 October 2008 | 265 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEC OF TRUST DATED 3 DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF PERSIAN CATS AND KITTENS WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION IN SUCH WAYS AS THE ASSOCIATION SHALL DECIDE INCLUDING (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) THE FOLLOWING WAYS: A) BY MAINTAINING A SHELTER OR CENTRES FOR TREATING UNWANTED, SICK AND ILL TREATED PERSIAN CATS AND KITTENS, B)BY THE PROVISION OF VETERINARY TREATMENT AND NEUTERING SERVICES FOR PERSIAN CATS, C) BY RE-HOMING STRAY, NEGLECTED AND UNWANTED PERSIANS
Area of benefit
DURHAM, NORTH YORKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window