NOTTINGHAM & EAST MIDLANDS REPETITIVE STRAIN INJURY SUPPORT GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MEMBERS NEWSLETTER , HELPLINE AND RESPONSES TO INTERNET CONACTS FOR INFORMATION ALSO.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 02 April 2001: Standard registration
- 03 May 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- NOTTINGHAM & EAST MIDLANDS R.S.I. SUPPORT GROUP (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2004 | 30/06/2005 | 30/06/2006 | 30/06/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.19k | £1.59k | £1.69k | £1.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.64k | £1.42k | £1.48k | £949 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | 18 August 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2006 | 26 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2005 | 25 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2004 | 25 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 JUNE 1990 AS AMENDED 2 SEPTEMBER 2000, AS FURTHER AMENDED 3 FEBRUARY 2001.
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS TO THOSE SUFFERING FROM ANY OF THE DISABILITIES KNOWN COLLECTIVELY AS REPETITIVE STRAIN INJURY BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON ALL MATTERS RELATED TO THE SAID DISABILITIES.
Area of benefit
EAST MIDLANDS AREA COMPRISING DERBYSHIRE, LEICESTERSHIRE, LINCOLNSHIRE AND NOTTINGHAMSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window