THE GROUNDSWELL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Groundswell provides relief of poverty, suffering and distress of those persons who are affected by or are caring for people affected by HIV and works to promote their health. Groundswell also provides education and training on HIV awareness to volunteers, churches and community groups. The charity mainly works in Hampshire but can extend across the UK and Uganda.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
- Southampton City
- Uganda
Governance
- 02 December 1999: Standard registration
- 25 November 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- GROUNDSWELL (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 30/06/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.14k | £50.35k | £32.41k | £27.41k | £5.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.77k | £68.28k | £38.75k | £34.55k | £48.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £25.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 24 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 28 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 28 October 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 28 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 28 October 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 28 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 28 October 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 JULY 1999, UPDATED BY DEED OF VARIATION 30/06/2004.
Charitable objects
1) FOR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF THOSE PERSONS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE AFFECTED BY OR ARE CARING FOR THOSE PERSONS AFFECTED BY HIV OR AIDS (AND/OR RELATED OR APPARENTLY RELATED DISEASES) AND THE PROTECTION AND PROMOTION OF THE HEALTH OF SUCH PERSONS; 2) FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROMOTION OF THE HEALTH OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN RESPECT OF HIV ISSUES BY RAISING THE PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THOSE ISSUES AND ASSISTING IN THE PREVENTION OF THE DISEASE BY RELEVANT DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION; 3) FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PRACTICAL CHRISTIANITY BY INITIATING ENCOURAGING AND FACILITATING CHURCHES AND THE MEMBERS AND ATTENDEES THEREOF TO RESPOND TO THE NEEDS OF ALL PERSONS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE LIVING WITH OR AFFECTED BY HIV OR AIDS (AND/OR RELATED OR APPARENTLY RELATED DISEASES) FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE TRUST DEED
Area of benefit
HAMPSHIRE, NATIONAL AND UGANDA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window