CROYDON ACCESSIBLE TRANSPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Not for profit community transport services provision.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,555 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Croydon
Governance
- 04 November 1999: Standard registration
- CAT (Working name)
- CATS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GERARD JOSEPH DEVINE | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|||||
David Harris | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Edward Thomas | Trustee | 22 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PETER GOLDER | Trustee | 29 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £504.45k | £155.50k | £155.22k | £169.16k | £184.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £495.67k | £209.60k | £232.19k | £214.74k | £231.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £342.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £39.63k | N/A | £21.25k | £10.11k | £10.56k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.86k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £504.45k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £590 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £495.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 OCT 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 DEC 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 JAN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 JAN 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO THE PEOPLE THAT LIVE AND WORK IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON AND ITS ENVIRONS WHO HAVE NEED BECAUSE OF AGE, MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISABILITY, OR POVERTY AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NO SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CORNERSTONE HOUSE
14 WILLIS ROAD
CROYDON
CR0 2XX
- Phone:
- 02086650861
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window