THE ASHLEY JOLLY SUDDEN ADULT DEATH TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Essex
Governance
- 07 March 2000: Standard registration
- 15 May 2007: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 15 May 2007: Funds transferred to 1113681 SADS UK
- SADS UK (Working name)
- SUDDEN ARRHYTHMIC DEATH SYNDROME TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.16k | £109.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.95k | £58.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 18 April 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 18 April 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 11 April 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 11 April 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH FEBRUARY 2000
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS OF PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED FROM SUDDEN BEREAVEMENT OR WHO ARE AWARE THAT THEY OR A FAMILY MEMBER ARE SUSCEPTIBLE TO POTENTIALLY SUDDEN DEATH THROUGH CERTAIN MEDICAL CONDITIONS, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND INFORMATION AND THE PROVISION OF FUNDS TO SUPPLY APPROPRIATE PREVENTATIVE EQUIPMENT(NOT NORMALLY MET FROM STATUTORY FUNDS) TO ASSIST IN DIMINISHING THE RISK OF SUDDEN DEATH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window