Financial history WILLASTON PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1079755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.80k £114 £1.77k £5.48k £4.87k
Total expenditure £2.47k £534 £366 £5.27k £5.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A