EAST DEAN AND FRISTON VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of village hall facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £914 from 2 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 29 October 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Hallett | Chair | 22 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lesley d'Urso | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Seeley | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jo Taylor | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tony Deadman | Trustee | 26 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Jane Carter | Trustee | 26 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Fletcher | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.45k | £24.19k | £57.09k | £66.00k | £65.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.40k | £33.95k | £36.18k | £55.55k | £67.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £600 | £836 | £914 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.43k | £16.75k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST JULY 1999
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF EAST DEAN AND FRISTON IN THE COUNTY OF EAST SUSSEX WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 2 (4) OF THE PUBLIC TRUSTEE ACT 1906 SHALL APPLY TO THE SAID COUNCIL AND TO THE COMMITTEE RESPECTIVELY IN LIKE MANNER AS THEY APPLY TO THE PUBLIC TRUSTEE AND MANAGING TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF EAST DEAN AND FRISTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
East Dean & Friston Village Hall
Village Green Lane
East Dean
EASTBOURNE
BN20 0DR
- Phone:
- 07542 683045
- Email:
- tina@edfvillagehall.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window