LEARNING COMMUNITIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to make it possible for the people of Lincolnshire and the surrounding areas to actively share in the growth of a sound and thriving community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Total income:
£646,550
Donations and legacies | £36.19k | |
Charitable activities | £575.04k | |
Other trading activities | £4.74k | |
Investments | £19.78k | |
Other | £10.80k |
Total expenditure:
£648,373
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £648.37k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £575,045 from government contract(s) and £35,650 from government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £648.37k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 18 February 2000: Standard registration
- 19 July 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BIRCHWOOD ACCESS AND TRAINING CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £406.34k | £1.46m | £1.83m | £1.29m | £646.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £431.22k | £1.53m | £1.54m | £1.44m | £648.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £1.51m | £1.17m | £575.04k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £35.65k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £3.44k | £1.66k | £83.03k | £36.19k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £4.82k | £4.46k | £3.37k | £4.74k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £1.45m | £1.82m | £1.17m | £575.04k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £0 | £12.38k | £19.78k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £24.62k | £10.80k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £1.52m | £1.43m | £1.41m | £648.37k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £13.51k | £12.01k | £21.20k | £10.54k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £98.96k | £29.23k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £10.59k | £10.79k | £76.67k | £67.43k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £410.55k | £333.89k | £68.76k | £35.95k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £516.90k | £154.89k | £84.02k | £43.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/04/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/01/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06/01/2014
Charitable objects
TO TRAIN EDUCATE AND REHABILITATE PERSONS RESIDENT IN BIRCHWOOD AND THE WIDER AREA OF THE CITY OF LINCOLN AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS WHO, BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES ARE UNABLE TO GAIN ANY SATISFACTORY EMPLOYMENT AND TO FURTHER THEIR FORMAL OR INFORMAL EDUCATION AND OTHERWISE RELIEVE HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS RESULTING FROM THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. SUCH OBJECTS SHALL BE COMPATIBLE WITH THE ECONOMIC REGENERATION OF BIRCHWOOD AND THE WIDER AREA OF THE CITY OF LINCOLN AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICTS.
Area of benefit
BIRCHWOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window