ST ALDATES PAROCHIAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help for people in conditions of need, hardship or distress in the city of Oxford, with a preference for residents in the ancient parish of St Aldate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 07 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 28 March 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anemi Wilton | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
James Andrew Mitchell | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Naomi Sian Elizabeth Waite | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Stephen Foster | Trustee | 26 September 2020 |
|
|||||||||
RICHARD CLIVE HUNTER | Trustee | 25 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
STEVE TUCK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 07/12/2019 | 07/12/2020 | 07/12/2021 | 07/12/2022 | 07/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £276.88k | £269.24k | £214.36k | £290.54k | £359.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £361.51k | £356.88k | £234.38k | £236.88k | £363.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 December 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 December 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 20 OCTOBER 1999
Charitable objects
APPLICATION OF THE INCOME OF THE CHURCH BRANCH. 1) SUBJECT AS AFORESAID THE CHURCH BRANCH SHARE OF THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE APPLIED FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES AND IN THE FOLLOWING ORDER OF PRIORITY:- (I) IN THE PAYMENT OF ANY CHARGES PROPERLY INCURRED BY THEM IN THE MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR OF THE FABRIC OF THE SAID PARISH CHURCH. (II) IN OR TOWARDS DEFRAYING THE COST OF ALTERATIONS AND ADDITIONS TO THE SAID FABRIC. (III) FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SERVICES IN THE SAID PARISH CHURCH. (IV) FOR FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE SAID ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH. 2) THE APPLICATION OF THE CHURCH BRANCH SHARE OF THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FOREGOING PROVISIONS MAY BE DELEGATED BY THE TRUSTEES TO THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST ALDATE, OXFORD. THE TRUSTEES MUST EXERCISE REASONABLE SUPERVISION OVER THE OPERATION OF ANY SUCH DELEGATED AUTHORITY AND THE SAID COUNCIL MUST ACCOUNT TO THE TRUSTEES EACH YEAR FOR THE APPLICATION OF THE SAID SHARE OF INCOME. APPLICATION OF THE INCOME OF THE POOR'S BRANCH 1)THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE POOR'S BRANCH SHARE ON THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS 2) THE TRUSTEES MAY PAY FOR SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES BY WAY OF DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS TO INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS WHICH PROVIDE OR WHICH UNDERTAKE IN RETURN TO PROVIDE SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR SUCH PERSONS 3) IN EXCEPTIONAL CASES THE TRUSTEES MAY GRANT RELIEF TO PERSONS OTHERWISE ELIGIBLE THEREFOR WHO ARE RESIDENT IMMEDIATELY OUTSIDE THE CITY OF OXFORD BUT IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES OUGHT NEVERTHELESS FOR SUFFICIENT REASON TO BE TREATED AS IF RESIDENT THEREIN OR WHO ARE LOCATED FOR THE TIME BEING WITHIN THE CITY OF OXFORD IN THIS SCHEME THE EXPRESSION "BENEFICIARIES" SHALL MEAN RESIDENTS OF THE CITY OF OXFORD WITH A PREFERENCE FOR RESIDENTS IN THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF ST ALDATE AND SUBJECT THERETO WITH A PREFERENCE FOR RESIDENTS IN OTHER PARTS OF THE SAID CITY WHO FORMERLY RESIDED IN THE SAID ANCIENT PARISH.
Area of benefit
THE ANCIENT PARISH OF ST ALDATES, OXFORD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 CUMNOR HILL
OXFORD
OX2 9EY
- Phone:
- 01865 254800
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window