Trustees THE WORDSWORTH SINGERS
Charity number: 1078908
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON NICHOLAS MORTIMER | Chair | 10 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Hutchinson | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Elizabeth Harland | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roger Martin Tringham | Trustee | 25 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Ulyatt | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Weakley | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CATHARINE SHARMAN | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOY HALL | Trustee | 16 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
JANET RUTH ELIZABETH HORNBY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.