TERN VALLEY VINTAGE MACHINERY TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The company is a charity and is principally engaged in the business of promoting interest in all forms of vintage machinery and vehicles. To achieve this object, the charity operates a number of projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 09 February 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gerry Hobday | Chair | 08 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Roger Hulme | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Johnson Mr | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.43k | £1.22k | £3.25k | £5.30k | £9.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.78k | £965 | £2.15k | £3.91k | £8.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 SEPTEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 3 AUGUST 2000 AND 11 DECEMBER 2000. CERTIFICATE UPON CHANGE DATED 26 JUNE 2000
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY INCREASING AND MAINTAINING INTEREST IN HISTORIC VINTAGE MACHINERY INCLUDING STEAM ENGINES, TRACTORS, THRESHING MACHINES AND HORSE DRAWN VEHICLES 2) TO GIVE GRANTS TO SUCH REGISTERED CHARITIES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT 3) FOR ANY SUCH OTHER GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Passedena
Lincoln Road
Wrockwardine Wood
TELFORD
TF2 6LN
- Phone:
- 01952410499
- Email:
- ROGER@VISTAINTERNET.CO.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window