MOULTON WINDMILL PROJECT LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To restore Moulton Mill to full wind power thus preserving the milling heritage of the fens and the tallest mill in the United Kingdom
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 24 December 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY ALAN HOARE | Chair | 14 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Ian Ronald Betts | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Monica Anne Lambert | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Richard Richardson | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES NICHOLAS WORTH | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Hall | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR JOHN GRIMWOOD | Trustee |
|
||||||
ALAN ROBERT LAMBERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JONATHAN BUCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHLEEN GRACE KEARNS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT OLDERSHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BYRON FREDERICK JOHN HAHN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.07k | £50.86k | £47.46k | £43.39k | £61.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.61k | £34.18k | £31.07k | £41.56k | £53.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £40.35k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 May 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 04 May 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 JUNE 1998
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE TOWNSPEOPLE OF THE DISTRICT OF SOUTH HOLLAND IN THE COUNTY OF LINCOLN AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE, WHATEVER OF THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND THE DISTRICT OF SOUTH HOLLAND AFORESAID IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS [INCLUDING ANY BUILDING AS DEFINED IN SECTION 336[1] OF THE TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING ACT 1990] OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST
Area of benefit
DISTRICT OF SOUTH HOLLAND IN THE COUNTY OF LINCOLN AND THE NATION AT LARGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Moulton Mill
High Street
Moulton
SPALDING
Lincolnshire
PE12 6QB
- Phone:
- 01406 373237
- Email:
- stevenadcock@tc-group.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window