Financial history WORCESTERSHIRE SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1082557
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £9.73k £5.27k £12.68k £22.64k £17.68k
Total expenditure £9.58k £5.12k £13.07k £19.17k £17.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A