THE CAMDEN PSYCHOTHERAPY UNIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Camden Psychotherapy unit provides short & long term psychological therapies to persons over the age of 18.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 10 February 2006: Standard registration
- CPU (Working name)
- CPU London (Working name)
- CAMDEN PSYCHOTHERAPY UNIT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Bloch | Chair | 12 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Jones Holden | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Saharin Rothschild | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marek Koperski | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alon Gurfinkel | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Caroline Dickinson | Trustee | 12 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £198.03k | £209.28k | £234.46k | £190.37k | £410.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £171.51k | £171.83k | £211.95k | £264.24k | £276.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 23 AUGUST 1999.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE A CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE RESIDING IN THE LONDON BOROUGHS BY PROMOTING MENTAL HEALTH BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISTRESS. IN THE PROMOTION OF THESE OBJECTS THE CAMDEN PSYCHOTHERAPY UNIT WILL ADHERE TO THE CODE OF PRACTICE OF THE BRITISH CONFEDERATION OF PSYCHOTHERAPISTS (BCP) AND/OR THE UNITED KINGDOM COUNCIL FOR PSYCHOTHERAPY.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE BOROUGHS OF GREATER LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
89 PRINCE OF WALES ROAD
LONDON
NW5 3NT
- Phone:
- 02072673881
- Email:
- service@cpulondon.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window