SALON 3
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
salon3 undertakes arts projects and produces cultural publications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Scotland
Governance
- 31 July 2000: Standard registration
- 09 January 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2012 | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £287 | £76 | £195 | £71 | £72 | |
|
Total expenditure | £48 | £47 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 30 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 21 May 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21ST MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE SAME IN FOSTERING AND PROMOTING ADVANCING MAINTAINING AND IMPROVING PUBLIC EDUCATION AND TO PROMOTE INTEREST IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE VISUAL ARTS AND IN AIDING ASSISTING NECESSITOUS ARTISTS AND PROMOTING AND IMPROVING ART AND THE PRODUCTION OF OBJECTS OF ARTISTIC MERIT AND IN PARTICULAR WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS: (A) TO PROMOTE ENCOURAGE SPONSOR OR MAINTAIN OR ASSIST IN THE PROMOTION ENCOURAGEMENT SPONSORING OR MAINTENANCE OF EDUCATIONAL EXHIBITIONS IN PUBLIC AND ELSEWHERE OF PAINTINGS AND SCULPTURE AND OTHER VISUAL WORKS OF ARTISTIC MERIT.(B) WHEN APPROPRIATE, TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE PREMISES FOR EXHIBITIONS OF PAINTINGS AND SCULPTURE AND OTHER WORKS OF ARTISTIC MERIT. (C) TO COMMISSION EITHER ALONE OR IN CONJUNCTION WITH OTHER WORKS OF ARTISTIC MERIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window