Financial history Yorkshire and Humberside Asbestos Victims Support Group

Charity number: 1080365
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £169.56k £153.60k £144.37k £189.43k £224.28k
Total expenditure £79.24k £117.68k £159.06k £192.79k £241.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A