Yorkshire and Humberside Asbestos Victims Support Group

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SARAG provides free, confidential, advice, help and support for people throughout the region suffering asbestos related diseases and their carers; and works to raise general public awareness of the issues facing victims, the incidence of asbestos diseases and the continuing hazard of asbestos.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnsley
- Bradford City
- City Of Wakefield
- Doncaster
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
- Nottinghamshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 17 April 2000: Standard registration
- SARAG (Working name)
- SHEFFIELD AND ROTHERHAM ASBESTOS GROUP (SARAG) (Previous name)
- SOUTH YORKSHIRE ASBESTOS VICTIMS SUPPORT GROUP (SARAG) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bob Fitzpatrick | Trustee | 24 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Whitfield | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beth Chesire | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helena Stanley | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Bolton | Trustee | 29 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL BALL | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £169.56k | £153.60k | £144.37k | £189.43k | £224.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.24k | £117.68k | £159.06k | £192.79k | £241.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18/10/1999 AS AMENDED ON 20/03/2000 AS AMENDED ON 17/02/2003 AS AMENDED ON 19/02/2014 AS AMENDED ON 27 JAN 2020 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20 DEC 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE TO ADVANCE THE AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC IN YORKSHIRE AND HUMBERSIDE (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) BY RAISING AWARENESS AMONGST MEDICAL STAFF, GENERAL PUBLIC AND WORKERS, IN THE DANGERS AND HAZARDS OF ASBESTOS AND ITS RELATED DISEASES, AND; TO RELIEVE PERSONS WITH ASBESTOS RELATED DISEASES BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT FROM SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 20
Moorgate Croft Business Centre
South Grove
ROTHERHAM
South Yorkshire
S60 2DH
- Phone:
- 01709360672
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window