Accounts and annual returns AMBLESIDE PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION (NW)
Charity number: 1087076

Charity reporting is overdue by 276 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 276 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 276 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 09 January 2024 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 January 2024 | 528 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 09 January 2024 | 893 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 September 2020 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window