GLOUCESTERSHIRE ACADEMY OF MUSIC LIMITED

Charity Number: 1085708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

MUSICAL AND PERFORMANCE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 March 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • GLOUCESTER ACADEMY OF MUSIC (Working name)
  • GLOUCESTER ACADEMY OF MUSIC AND PERFORMING ARTS LIMITED (Previous name)
  • MUSIC@BMGGAMPA LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Kemp Trustee 25 March 2024
None on record
Supriya Kesevan Trustee 14 December 2023
None on record
Charles Frederic Basil Woodd Trustee 22 May 2023
None on record
Fenner Curtis Trustee 28 November 2022
None on record
Amelia Conway-Jones Trustee 28 November 2022
None on record
Deborah Lanyon Trustee 28 November 2022
None on record
Ian Richard Mean Trustee 23 May 2022
None on record
Jennifer Aviss Trustee 10 January 2022
None on record
Gillian Margaret Greenwell Trustee 12 April 2021
None on record
Dr Damian Kenny Trustee 03 October 2018
GLOUCESTERSHIRE SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
Received: On time
Stephen Philip Belinfante Trustee 21 January 2015
None on record
Vivienne Manuelita Rae Hargreaves Trustee 20 March 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £302.93k £298.44k £326.24k £524.92k £511.42k
Total expenditure £310.58k £301.92k £342.76k £452.95k £420.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £236.79k £179.48k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £7.70k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £272.77k £314.12k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £854 £630
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £14.52k £9.48k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £409.45k £420.45k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £43.50k £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £1.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A £16.67k £14.15k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A £286.60k £353.98k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A £34.17k £8.07k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 05 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 05 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 14 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 14 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 11 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 11 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 26 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 22 January 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BARBICAN HOUSE
31
BARBICAN ROAD
GLOUCESTER
GL1 2JF
Phone:
01452 668592