THE CARTER'S MEADOW TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MANAGEMENT OF LAND KNOWN AS CARTERS MEADOW FOR VILLAGE AMENITY. PLANTING OF O4 300 NATIVE TREES, CREATION OF WILD FLOWER AREA, MAINTENANCE OF POND AND FOOTPATHS. MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE SETS OUT OBJECTIVES FOR THE YEAR AND IS SUPPORTED BY VOLUNTEERS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Suffolk
Governance
- 16 May 2000: Standard registration
- THE CARTER'S MEADOW TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW GEORGE STRINGER | Chair | 04 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Payne | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Woods | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Pollintine | Trustee | 22 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Howard Gibbs | Trustee | 19 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH SARAH FEARN | Trustee | 26 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JAMES COLINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29 | £0 | £0 | £62 | £623 | |
|
Total expenditure | £149 | £120 | £58 | £785 | £70 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 11 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27 MARCH 2000 AS AMENDED 2 SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE MANAGING AND ADMINISTRATION OF THE LAND IN MEMORY OF MRS LLOYDS FATHER AS A RECREATIONAL AMENITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF COTTON SUFFOLK BUT SUBJECT TO THE FOLLOWING RESTRICTIONS- 1. THE LAND SHALL BE KEPT AS A PERMANENT OPEN SPACE 2. THE LAND MAY NOT BE SOLD BUT WILL BE HELD IN PERPETUITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF COTTON 3. NO BUILDING OR STRUCTURE SHALL BE ALLOWED ON THE LAND EXCEPT AS ANCILLARY TO THE USE OF THE LAND (EG A SPORTS PAVILION)
Area of benefit
PARISH OF COTTON, SUFFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Double Corner
Mendlesham Road
Cotton
STOWMARKET
IP14 4RF
- Phone:
- 01449766650
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window