Accounts and annual returns ANURAG BAUL SHILPI

Charity Number: 1085369
Charity reporting is overdue by 1324 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 228 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 228 days
Annual return 30 November 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 594 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 594 days
Annual return 30 November 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 959 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 959 days
Annual return 30 November 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1324 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1324 days
Annual return 30 November 2019 30 April 2021 212 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required