Financial history MANKIND INITIATIVE

Charity number: 1089547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £256.06k £198.85k £156.63k £102.31k £149.69k
Total expenditure £197.18k £91.76k £89.89k £110.94k £137.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £182.07k £114.86k £55.74k £24.00k N/A