MANKIND INITIATIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ManKind Initiative is a national charity providing an information, support and signposting service to male victims of domestic abuse and their families. The helpline is manned by trained people who give information and support on all aspects of domestic abuse. We signpost people to refuges, local authorities and other support services where appropriate as well as undertake lectures and workshops.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 November 2001: Standard registration
- MANKIND (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK BROOKS | Chair | 09 October 2007 |
|
|||||
Robin Parkes | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexandra Papamichail | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Eagle-Service | Trustee | 29 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ben Hine | Trustee | 25 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR Elizabeth Bates | Trustee | 21 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lori Busch | Trustee | 15 November 2010 |
|
|
||||
MRS ROZ WILLIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £256.06k | £198.85k | £156.63k | £102.31k | £149.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £197.18k | £91.76k | £89.89k | £110.94k | £137.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £182.07k | £114.86k | £55.74k | £24.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 09 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 09 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 2 NOVEMBER, 1999 AND AMENDED ON 15 MAY, 2001 AND 1 NOVEMBER, 2001. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 JUL 2017 as amended on 29 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
1 THE ALLEVIATION OF HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR AMONGST THOSE SUFFERING SUCH HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AS A RESULT OF BREAK UP OF MARRIAGE AND FAMILY; 2 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF MEN'S HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL IN SUCH WAYS AS THE COMPANY SHALL DECIDE; 3 THE PREVENTION OF DISCRIMINATION AGAINST MALES ON THE GROUND OF SEX SO FAR AS SUCH DISCRIMINATION IS UNLAWFUL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLOOK HOUSE
BELVEDERE ROAD
TAUNTON
SOMERSET
TA1 1BT
- Phone:
- 01823334244
- Email:
- admin@mankind.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window