Financial history THE AFRICAN CHILD (UK)

Charity number: 1079610
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £194.22k £200.97k £203.33k £303.01k £256.31k
Total expenditure £184.21k £207.78k £201.74k £295.20k £264.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A