LIFETIMES CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lifetimes empowers the community and voluntary sector. We facilitate networking events, providing bespoke training, support and community information with our unique directories and reports. We are specialists in delivering services to hard to reach sectors of the community. We are experts in the fields of volunteering brokerage and mental health training..
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 05 August 2008: Standard registration
- WVSDA (Working name)
- WANDSWORTH VOLUNTARY SECTOR DEVELOPMENT AGENCY (Previous name)
- WANDSWORTH VOLUNTEER BUREAU (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NATHALIE GIBSON-WILSON | Chair | 21 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Indira O'Reilly | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARIE LANE | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE CLARK | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.22m | £934.04k | £2.22m | £38.09k | £97.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.01m | £783.32k | £306.43k | £30.83k | £60.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.11m | £721.81k | £2.19m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £26.60k | £16.00k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £14.72k | £12.72k | £5.05k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £63.51k | £183.51k | £13.83k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £111.52k | £176.39k | £306.43k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £6.50k | £6.50k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £13.81k | £5.14k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £892.64k | £600.42k | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 08 DEC 2021 as amended on 10 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN LONDON, THE HOME COUNTIES AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY DISTRESS AND SICKNESS. B) TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. THE HOME COUNTIES SHALL MEAN BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, HERTFORDSHIRE, ESSEX, BERKSHIRE, MIDDLESEX, SURREY, KENT AND SUSSEX.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF WANDSWORTH, CENTRAL LONDON, AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Linked charities
- 05 August 2008 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
LIFETIMES CHARITY
18 concanon road
LONDON
sw2 5ta
- Phone:
- 0208 8752845
- Email:
- info@life-times.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window