Financial history KINGS NYMPTON PARISH HALL

Charity Number: 1113721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.92k £32.77k £19.24k £12.33k £10.14k
Total expenditure £19.56k £21.15k £7.42k £17.26k £11.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.00k N/A N/A £3.50k £1.50k