Accounts and annual returns MASE - THE MUSIC AND SOUND EXPERIENCE

Charity number: 1080882
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 11 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 11 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2005 Not submitted