CHANGE, GROW, LIVE

Charity Number: 1079327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

CGL provides a range of services to support individuals, families and communities whose lives are adversely affected by crime, substance misuse, homelessness, anti-social behaviour, domestic violence, social deprivation and lack of opportunity. The Charity works with challenging service users with complex needs, including those with entrenched drug habits and offending behaviour.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 February 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • CRI (Working name)
  • CRIME REDUCTION INITIATIVES (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Ann Killen Chair 14 December 2021
BOUNCE BACK FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Hamza Drabu Trustee 18 September 2024
None on record
Jonathan Paull-Harry Trustee 18 September 2024
None on record
Michael Vavakis Trustee 13 December 2023
None on record
Richard William Wilson Trustee 21 September 2022
BOUNCE BACK FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Go Beyond Charity
Received: On time
Timothy Richard Sampey Trustee 14 December 2021
BOUNCE BACK FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Deborah Ruth Rozansky Trustee 14 December 2021
BOUNCE BACK FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Craig Nicholas Denholm Trustee 24 March 2020
BOUNCE BACK FOUNDATION
Received: On time
CAROLINE MARY SHULDHAM Trustee 24 March 2020
BOUNCE BACK FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £219.12m £220.13m £242.23m £284.26m £307.34m
Total expenditure £213.23m £213.84m £238.68m £283.20m £309.54m
Income from government contracts £217.69m £219.73m £242.23m £248.45m £254.95m
Income from government grants £1.44m £397.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £45.00k £530.00k £219.00k £128.06k £105.42k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £218.81m £219.39m £232.93m £282.50m £304.42m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £269.00k £204.00k £72.00k £808.00k £1.85m
Income - Other £0 £0 £9.00m £826.09k £965.62k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £213.23m £213.77m £238.68m £283.20m £309.54m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £72.47k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £70.00k £82.00k £185.00k £219.30k £240.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £8.56m £8.33m £9.18m £9.02m £8.66m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £230.00k
Other assets £75.22m £88.69m £105.95m £116.38m £117.01m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£2.84m -£3.87m -£3.01m -£1.10m -£887.00k
Total liabilities £47.49m £55.36m £69.13m £78.37m £81.39m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 28 APRIL 1966, AMENDED 28 MAY 1975 AND 10 APRIL 1980. FURTHER AMENDED 5 OCTOBER 2004 AND 19 JANUARY 2006 AS AFFECTED BY A UNITING DIRECTION (MADE UNDER S.96 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993) AND DATED 01 FEBRUARY 2006.
Charitable objects
(A) EDUCATE AND TRAIN AND RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AMONG PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING OR WHO HAVE SUFFERED A LEGAL RESTRICTION OF THEIR LIABILITY IN ANY PENAL OR CORRECTIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OR THROUGH ANY MEANS WHATEVER AND THE FAMILIES OF SUCH PERSONS AND (B) TO FURTHER AND PROMOTE THE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS AND METHODS OF THE PREVENTION OF CRIME AND DELINQUENCY AND TO OBTAIN AND MAKE RECORDS OF AND DISSEMINATE INFORMATION CONCERNING THE SAME, AND (C) TO PROMOTE, SUPPORT OR CARRY ON EITHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY BODY, AUTHORITY OR PERSON, ANY PROJECT OR SCHEME IN CONNECTION WITH ANY METHODS OF THE PREVENTION OF CRIME AND DELINQUENCY AND TO PROVIDE MONEY FOR SUCH PERSONS WHETHER BY LOAN OR OTHERWISE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 07 February 2006 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
North Suite
1st Floor
1 Jubilee Street
Brighton
East Sus
Phone:
01273677019