ALA-SUNNAT CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable activities, education and training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- 19 June 2001: Standard registration
- CULTURAL CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
QUMAR DIN POSWALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAFIQUE MOHAMMED JOHN POSWALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED SHARIF SHARIF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IQBAL MOHAMMED SHARIF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHARIF BAJAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED SHAFIQUE POSWALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARDAR MOHAMMED POSWALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAEED AKHTAR POSWALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Saleem Poswall | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Akram Bajar AM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.96k | £17.15k | £16.70k | £21.66k | £23.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.16k | £8.61k | £9.46k | £11.97k | £29.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 SEPTEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED 8 APRIL 2001
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ISLAMIC RELIGION AND CULTURE FOR THE BENEFITS OF MUSLIMS AND OTHER INTERESTED PEOPLE IN SOUTHAMPTON. (B) TO PROMOTE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE FACILITIES FOR CONGREGATION PRAYERS, PERFORMING LAST RITES FOR DECEASED MUSLIMS, PERFORMING MARRIAGE AND OTHER SOCIAL CEREMONIES. (C) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES FOR THOSE PERSONS THAT HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. (D) TO PROVIDE HELP AND RELIEF TO MUSLIMS AND OTHERS WHO ARE IN NEED (FINANCIAL OR OTHERWISE). (E) TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF BUILDINGS, FOR THE HOLDING OF ISLAMIC PRAYERS FOR WOMEN OF SOUTHAMPTON
Area of benefit
SOUTHAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
OLD VICARAGE
CRANFORD WAY
SOUTHAMPTON
SO17 1RN
- Phone:
- 02380556219
- Email:
- abajar7862003@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window