POWYS YOUNG CARERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Powys
Governance
- 09 December 1999: Standard registration
- 14 December 2004: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 14 December 2004: Funds transferred to 1103712 CREDU SUPPORTING YOUNG AND ADULT CARERS LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 01 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 01 December 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 MAY 1999
Charitable objects
1.TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE CARE RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF YOUNG CARERS; 2. TO CREATE AWARENESS AND KNOWLEDGE OF THE NEEDS OF YOUNG CARERS; 3. TO BRING THE NEEDS OF YOUNG CARERS TO THE ATTENTION OF POLICY MAKERS AND SERVICE PROVIDERS. 4. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PERSONS IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH CARE EDUCATION AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE POWYS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window