FRIENDS OF GRAVES PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist other Trusts with interests in Graves Park in enhancing and maintaining the park for leisure, education and conservation in conjunction with the local community and in particular the citizens of Sheffield. To preserve the fauna and flora for the benefit and enjoyment of park users. To act as a conduit in raising funds to achieve those objects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 19 April 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLINE D DEWAR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Peter Robert Bragg | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Edwards | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Kent Hobson | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Hartlebury | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
ERNEST WILLIAM BREWIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA GREATOREX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEVEN CHAPMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.95k | £9.55k | £5.56k | £10.42k | £149.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.85k | £1.35k | £3.91k | £4.86k | £144.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 SEPTEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED 22 MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
(1) TO ASSIST OTHER TRUSTS WITH INTERESTS IN GRAVES PARK IN ENHANCING AND MAINTAINING THE PARK FOR LEISURE, EDUCATION AND CONSERVATION IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE LOCAL COMMUNITY (2) TO PRESERVE THE FLORA AND FAUNA FOR THE BENEFIT AND ENJOYMENT OF THE PARK USERS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
141 MOUNT VIEW ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S8 8PJ
- Phone:
- 01142589562
- Email:
- friends@gravespark.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window