SLOUGH REFUGEE SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Slough Refugee Support is committed to helping asylum seekers and refugees in Slough and neighbouring areas to be safe, mentally and physically healthy, to achieve their rights and to settle with dignity in a new community. We do this by delivering immigration advice, assisting with access to public services, by giving 'outreach' support to refugee families, and through a range of other services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £53,862 from 5 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Slough
Governance
- 09 March 2000: Standard registration
- 13 February 2019: Funds received from 1078847 SLOUGH VOLUNTEER BUREAU
- SRS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Kennedy | Trustee | 23 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mehmuda Mian | Trustee | 23 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marriyah Shakoor | Trustee | 23 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zakarya Al sharabi Sayeed | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Cliff Shanganya | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Louise Sprackling | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Denise Scotland FCCA FMAAT | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Hamed | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Woof | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|||||
RUPERT YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.64k | £253.63k | £282.37k | £228.77k | £205.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £168.56k | £173.40k | £200.45k | £247.60k | £212.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £125.19k | £110.12k | £99.35k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £80.00k | £89.83k | £53.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 2 NOVEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED 2 DECEMBER 1999, 15 NOVEMBER 2002 AND 13 MARCH 2008.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES IN SLOUGH AND NEIGHBOURING LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS, AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
SLOUGH AND OTHER NEIGHBOURING LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Slough Refugee Support
28 Bath Road
SLOUGH
SL1 3SR
- Phone:
- 01753537142
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window