Accounts and annual returns THE CORNERSTONE PROJECT

Charity number: 1080416
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2008 26 November 2009 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 26 November 2009 26 days late
Annual return 31 December 2007 30 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 30 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 18 December 2007 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 18 December 2007 48 days late
Annual return 31 December 2005 15 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 27 November 2006 27 days late