Financial history THE CORNERSTONE PROJECT

Charity number: 1080416
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2004 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008
Total gross income £27.55k £31.17k £66.45k £95.54k £83.42k
Total expenditure £31.50k £25.37k £47.30k £90.47k £85.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A