THE CORNERSTONE PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 20 April 2000: Standard registration
- 18 February 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.55k | £31.17k | £66.45k | £95.54k | £83.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.50k | £25.37k | £47.30k | £90.47k | £85.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 26 November 2009 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 26 November 2009 | 26 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 30 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 30 October 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 18 December 2007 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 18 December 2007 | 48 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 15 September 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 27 November 2006 | 27 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 SEPTEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED 22 MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF YOUNG PERSON'S BETWEEN THE AGES OF 12 TO 23 YEARS OF AGE, WHO ARE IN NEED, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ADVICE, AN ADVOCACY AND COUNSELLING SERVICE AND BY SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window